NC H1852 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Introduced on May 18 2010 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-07-01 - Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
Pending: House Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 18 2010 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-07-01 - Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
Pending: House Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Study Nonprofit Grants Accountability
Title
Study Nonprofit Grants Accountability
Sponsors
Rep. Nelson Cole [D] | Rep. James Crawford [D] | Rep. Jean Farmer-Butterfield [D] | Rep. Richard Glazier [D] |
Rep. Sandra Hughes [D] | Rep. Verla Insko [D] | Rep. Timothy Spear [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-07-01 | Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House | |
2010-07-01 | Reptd Fav Com Sub 2 | |
2010-06-02 | Re-ref Com On Judiciary II | |
2010-06-02 | Reptd Fav Com Substitute | |
2010-05-20 | Ref to the Com on State Government/State Personnel, if favorable, Judiciary II | |
2010-05-20 | Passed 1st Reading | |
2010-05-18 | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S1218 (Same As) 2010-05-19 - Ref To Com On Appropriations/Base Budget