NC H1864 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-3)
Status: Passed on July 1 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-07-01 - Ch. SL 2010-33
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-3)
Status: Passed on July 1 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-07-01 - Ch. SL 2010-33
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
No High School Graduation Proj. Required
Title
No High School Graduation Proj. Required
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-06-17 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-07-01 | Ch. SL 2010-33 | |
2010-07-01 | Signed By Gov. 7/1/2010 | |
2010-06-22 | Pres. To Gov. 6/22/2010 | |
2010-06-21 | Ratified | |
2010-06-17 | Passed 2nd & 3rd Reading | |
2010-06-16 | Reptd Fav | |
2010-06-07 | Ref To Com On Education/Higher Education | |
2010-06-04 | Rec From House | |
2010-06-03 | Passed 2nd & 3rd Reading | |
2010-06-02 | Placed On Cal For 6/3/2010 | |
2010-06-01 | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) | |
2010-06-01 | Reptd Fav | |
2010-05-20 | Ref To Com On Education | |
2010-05-20 | Passed 1st Reading | |
2010-05-18 | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S1253 (Same As) 2010-05-20 - Ref To Com On Education/Higher Education