NC H1869 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 10 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-06-10 - Ch. Res 2010-7
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 10 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-06-10 - Ch. Res 2010-7
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Honor Randolph County Honor Guard
Title
Honor Randolph County Honor Guard
Sponsors
Rep. Harold Brubaker [R] | Rep. Becky Carney [D] | Rep. Jerry Dockham [R] | Rep. Mary Harrison [D] |
Rep. Sandra Hughes [D] | Rep. Patricia Hurley [R] |
Roll Calls
2010-06-09 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-06-10 | Ch. Res 2010-7 | |
2010-06-10 | Ratified | |
2010-06-09 | Passed 2nd & 3rd Reading | |
2010-06-09 | Placed On Cal For 6/9/2010 | |
2010-06-09 | Rec From House | |
2010-06-09 | Passed 2nd & 3rd Reading | |
2010-06-08 | Placed On Cal For 6/9/2010 | |
2010-06-07 | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) | |
2010-06-07 | Reptd Fav | |
2010-05-20 | Ref To Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House | |
2010-05-20 | Passed 1st Reading | |
2010-05-19 | Filed |