NC H1893 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 9 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-07-09 - Ch. SL 2010-82
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 9 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-07-09 - Ch. SL 2010-82
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
W-S/Ashe Fox Trapping/Greene Hunting
Title
W-S/Ashe Fox Trapping/Greene Hunting
Sponsors
Rep. Larry Brown [R] | Rep. Jerry Dockham [R] | Rep. Sandra Hughes [D] | Rep. William McGee [R] |
Sen. Earline Parmon [D] | Rep. Larry Womble [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-07-09 | Ch. SL 2010-82 | |
2010-07-09 | Ratified | |
2010-07-08 | Concurred In S/Com Sub | |
2010-07-08 | Placed On Cal For 7/8/2010 | |
2010-07-08 | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) | |
2010-07-08 | Reptd Fav To Concur | |
2010-07-07 | Ref To Com On Wildlife Resources | |
2010-07-07 | Rec To Concur S Com Sub | |
2010-07-07 | Passed 2nd & 3rd Reading | |
2010-07-07 | Placed On Cal For 7/7/2010 | |
2010-07-07 | Com Substitute Adopted | |
2010-07-07 | Reptd Fav Com Substitute | |
2010-06-30 | Ref To Com On State and Local Government | |
2010-06-30 | Rec From House | |
2010-06-30 | Passed 2nd & 3rd Reading | |
2010-06-29 | Placed On Cal For 6/30/2010 | |
2010-06-29 | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) | |
2010-06-29 | Reptd Fav | |
2010-06-09 | Re-ref Com On Local Government I | |
2010-06-09 | Reptd Fav Com Substitute | |
2010-05-20 | Ref to the Com on Wildlife Resources, if favorable, Local Government I | |
2010-05-20 | Passed 1st Reading | |
2010-05-19 | Filed |