NC H19 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 20 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-06-20 - Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
Pending: Senate Rules and Operations of the Senate Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

Certain DRE Equipment

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Certain DRE Equipment

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-19 - House - Second Reading (Y: 111 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 6) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-20SenateRef To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
2019-06-20SenatePassed 1st Reading
2019-06-20SenateRegular Message Received From House
2019-06-20HouseRegular Message Sent To Senate
2019-06-19HousePassed 3rd Reading
2019-06-19HousePassed 2nd Reading
2019-06-19HouseAdded to Calendar
2019-06-19HouseCal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
2019-06-19HouseReptd Fav Com Substitute
2019-03-07HouseRe-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
2019-03-07HouseWithdrawn From Com
2019-03-07HouseRe-ref to the Com on Appropriations, Capital, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
2019-03-07HouseWithdrawn From Com
2019-02-05HouseRef to the Com on Education - Community Colleges, if favorable, Appropriations, Capital, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
2019-02-05HousePassed 1st Reading
2019-02-04HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

S6 (Same As) 2019-03-29 - Ch. SL 2019-9

North Carolina State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback