NC H191 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-2)
Status: Introduced on February 26 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-20 - Re-ref Com On Appropriations, General Government
Pending: House Appropriations Subcommittee on General Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 26 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-20 - Re-ref Com On Appropriations, General Government
Pending: House Appropriations Subcommittee on General Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Housing Recovery/Restore Greensboro Funds
Title
Housing Recovery/Restore Greensboro Funds
Sponsors
Rep. Ashton Clemmons [D] | Rep. Amos Quick [D] | Rep. Jonathan Hardister [R] | Rep. John Faircloth [R] |
Rep. Cecil Brockman [D] | Rep. Charles Graham [D] | Rep. Mary Harrison [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-20 | House | Re-ref Com On Appropriations, General Government |
2019-03-20 | House | Reptd Fav |
2019-02-27 | House | Ref to the Com on State and Local Government, if favorable, Appropriations, General Government, if favorable, Appropriations, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2019-02-27 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2019-02-26 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S110 (Same As) 2019-03-04 - Re-ref to Appropriations/Base Budget. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate
North Carolina State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ncleg.gov/BillLookUp/2019/H191 |
Text | https://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2019/Bills/House/PDF/H191v0.pdf |
Text | https://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2019/Bills/House/PDF/H191v1.pdf |