NC H1910 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 1 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-07-01 - Ch. SL 2010-47
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 1 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-07-01 - Ch. SL 2010-47
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Shelby May Inspect Cleveland County Vehicles
Title
Shelby May Inspect Cleveland County Vehicles
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-06-30 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-07-01 | Ch. SL 2010-47 | |
2010-07-01 | Ratified | |
2010-06-30 | Passed 2nd & 3rd Reading | |
2010-06-29 | Reptd Fav | |
2010-06-22 | Ref To Com On State and Local Government | |
2010-06-22 | Rec From House | |
2010-06-21 | Passed 2nd & 3rd Reading | |
2010-06-17 | Placed On Cal For 6/21/2010 | |
2010-06-16 | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) | |
2010-06-16 | Reptd Fav | |
2010-05-20 | Ref To Com On Local Government I | |
2010-05-20 | Passed 1st Reading | |
2010-05-19 | Filed |