NC H1919 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 1 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-07-01 - Ch. SL 2010-52
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 1 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-07-01 - Ch. SL 2010-52
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Matthews Public-Private Projects
Title
Matthews Public-Private Projects
Sponsors
Rep. Kelly Alexander [D] | Rep. Martha Alexander [D] | Rep. Becky Carney [D] | Rep. Patricia Cotham [R] |
Rep. Beverly Earle [D] | Rep. Jim Gulley [R] | Rep. Ruth Samuelson [R] | Rep. Thomas Tillis [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-07-01 | Ch. SL 2010-52 | |
2010-07-01 | Ratified | |
2010-07-01 | Passed 2nd & 3rd Reading | |
2010-06-30 | Reptd Fav | |
2010-06-29 | Ref To Com On Finance | |
2010-06-28 | Rec From House | |
2010-06-28 | Passed 2nd & 3rd Reading | |
2010-06-24 | Placed On Cal For 6/28/2010 | |
2010-06-24 | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) | |
2010-06-24 | Reptd Fav Com Substitute | |
2010-06-09 | Re-ref Com On Finance | |
2010-06-09 | Reptd Fav | |
2010-05-24 | Ref to the Com on Local Government I, if favorable, Finance | |
2010-05-24 | Passed 1st Reading | |
2010-05-20 | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S1295 (Same As) 2010-05-20 - Ref To Com On Finance