NC H1927 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on May 20 2010 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-06-09 - Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
Pending: House Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 20 2010 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-06-09 - Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
Pending: House Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
DCR Study Endor Iron Furnace/Funds
Title
DCR Study Endor Iron Furnace/Funds
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-06-09 | Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House | |
2010-06-09 | Withdrawn From Com | |
2010-05-24 | Ref To Com On Appropriations | |
2010-05-24 | Passed 1st Reading | |
2010-05-20 | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S1353 (Same As) 2010-05-25 - Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate