NC H1935 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 21 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-06-21 - Ch. SL 2010-8
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 21 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-06-21 - Ch. SL 2010-8
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Mecklenburg Law Enforce.Cap Upped/Stipend
Title
Mecklenburg Law Enforce.Cap Upped/Stipend
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-06-21 | Ch. SL 2010-8 | |
2010-06-21 | Ratified | |
2010-06-17 | Passed 2nd & 3rd Reading | |
2010-06-16 | Reptd Fav | |
2010-06-14 | Ref To Com On Pensions & Retirement & Aging | |
2010-06-11 | Rec From House | |
2010-06-10 | Passed 2nd & 3rd Reading | |
2010-06-10 | Amend Adopted 1 | |
2010-06-09 | Placed On Cal For 6/10/2010 | |
2010-06-09 | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) | |
2010-06-09 | Reptd Fav Com Substitute | |
2010-05-26 | Re-ref Com On Pensions and Retirement | |
2010-05-26 | Reptd Fav | |
2010-05-25 | Ref to the Com on Local Government I, if favorable, Pensions and Retirement | |
2010-05-25 | Passed 1st Reading | |
2010-05-20 | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S1402 (Same As) 2010-05-26 - Ref To Com On Pensions & Retirement & Aging