NC H1940 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 22-11)
Status: Passed on June 3 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-06-03 - Ch. Res 2010-4
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 22-11)
Status: Passed on June 3 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-06-03 - Ch. Res 2010-4
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Honoring NC Veterans on Memorial Day
Title
Honoring NC Veterans on Memorial Day
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-06-02 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-06-03 | Ch. Res 2010-4 | |
2010-06-03 | Ratified | |
2010-06-02 | Passed 2nd & 3rd Reading | |
2010-06-01 | Placed On Cal For 6/2/2010 | |
2010-06-01 | Withdrawn From Com | |
2010-05-27 | Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate | |
2010-05-27 | Rec From House | |
2010-05-26 | Passed 2nd & 3rd Reading | |
2010-05-25 | Placed On Cal For 5/26/2010 | |
2010-05-25 | Cal Pursuant 32(a) | |
2010-05-25 | Passed 1st Reading | |
2010-05-24 | Filed |