NC H1941 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on May 24 2010 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-06-16 - Re-ref Com On Pensions and Retirement
Pending: House Pensions and Retirement Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 24 2010 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-06-16 - Re-ref Com On Pensions and Retirement
Pending: House Pensions and Retirement Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Increase Wilkesboro Firemen's Pension
Title
Increase Wilkesboro Firemen's Pension
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-06-16 | Re-ref Com On Pensions and Retirement | |
2010-06-16 | Reptd Fav | |
2010-05-25 | Ref to the Com on Local Government II, if favorable, Pensions and Retirement | |
2010-05-25 | Passed 1st Reading | |
2010-05-24 | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S1356 (Same As) 2010-06-28 - Ch. SL 2010-23