NC H1944 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 8 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-07-08 - Ch. SL 2010-77
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 8 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-07-08 - Ch. SL 2010-77
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Bermuda Run Debt Collection/Gates & Fences
Title
Bermuda Run Debt Collection/Gates & Fences
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-07-08 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2010-07-07 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2010-07-07 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-07-08 | Ch. SL 2010-77 | |
2010-07-08 | Ratified | |
2010-07-08 | Passed 3rd Reading | |
2010-07-07 | Passed 2nd Reading | |
2010-07-07 | Placed On Cal For 7/7/2010 | |
2010-07-07 | Reptd Fav | |
2010-07-06 | Ref To Com On Finance | |
2010-07-06 | Rec From House | |
2010-07-06 | Passed 3rd Reading | |
2010-07-01 | Passed 2nd Reading | |
2010-06-30 | Placed On Cal For 7/1/2010 | |
2010-06-30 | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) | |
2010-06-30 | Reptd Fav | |
2010-06-16 | Re-ref Com On Finance | |
2010-06-16 | Reptd Fav | |
2010-05-25 | Ref to the Com on Local Government II, if favorable, Finance | |
2010-05-25 | Passed 1st Reading | |
2010-05-24 | Filed |