NC H1960 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on May 24 2010 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-06-24 - Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
Pending: House Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 24 2010 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-06-24 - Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
Pending: House Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Graham Deannexation
Title
Graham Deannexation
Sponsors
Rep. Alice Bordsen [D] | Rep. Dan Ingle [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-06-24 | Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House | |
2010-06-24 | Withdrawn From Cal | |
2010-06-23 | Placed On Cal For 6/24/2010 | |
2010-06-23 | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) | |
2010-06-23 | Reptd Fav | |
2010-06-16 | Re-ref Com On Finance | |
2010-06-16 | Reptd Fav Com Substitute | |
2010-05-25 | Ref to the Com on Local Government II, if favorable, Finance | |
2010-05-25 | Passed 1st Reading | |
2010-05-24 | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S1389 (Same As) 2010-06-30 - Ch. SL 2010-27