NC H1973 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-2)
Status: Passed on July 22 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-07-22 - Ch. SL 2010-147
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-2)
Status: Passed on July 22 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-07-22 - Ch. SL 2010-147
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Various Economic Incentives
Title
Various Economic Incentives
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-07-09 - Senate - Conference Rpt\Motion 7\To Adopt (Y: 26 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-07-07 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 24 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2010-07-07 - Senate - Amendment 6 (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2010-07-07 - Senate - Amendment 5 (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2010-07-06 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 26 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2010-07-06 - Senate - Amendment 4 (Y: 26 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2010-07-06 - Senate - Amendment 3 (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2010-07-06 - Senate - Amendment 1 (Y: 28 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2010-07-07 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 24 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2010-07-07 - Senate - Amendment 6 (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2010-07-07 - Senate - Amendment 5 (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2010-07-06 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 26 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2010-07-06 - Senate - Amendment 4 (Y: 26 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2010-07-06 - Senate - Amendment 3 (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2010-07-06 - Senate - Amendment 1 (Y: 28 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-07-22 | Ch. SL 2010-147 | |
2010-07-22 | Signed By Gov. 7/22/2010 | |
2010-07-10 | Pres. To Gov. 7/10/2010 | |
2010-07-10 | Ratified | |
2010-07-10 | Conf Report Adopted 3rd | |
2010-07-09 | Conf Report Adopted | |
2010-07-09 | Conf Report Adopted 2nd | |
2010-07-08 | Placed On Cal For 7/9/2010 | |
2010-07-08 | Conf Com Reported | |
2010-07-08 | Placed On Cal For 7/9/2010 | |
2010-07-08 | Conf Report Held As Material | |
2010-07-08 | Conf Com Reported | |
2010-07-08 | Conf Com Appointed | |
2010-07-08 | Conf Com Appointed | |
2010-07-08 | Failed concur in S/Com Sub | |
2010-07-07 | Placed On Cal For 7/8/2010 | |
2010-07-07 | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) | |
2010-07-07 | Com Sub Ruled Material | |
2010-07-07 | Rec To Concur S Com Sub | |
2010-07-07 | Engrossed | |
2010-07-07 | Passed 3rd Reading | |
2010-07-07 | Amend Adopted # 6 | |
2010-07-07 | Amend Adopted # 5 | |
2010-07-06 | Passed 2nd Reading | |
2010-07-06 | Amend Adopted # 4 | |
2010-07-06 | Amend Adopted # 3 | |
2010-07-06 | Amend # 2 Not Germane | |
2010-07-06 | Amend Adopted # 1 | |
2010-07-01 | Placed On Cal For 7/6/2010 | |
2010-07-01 | Com Substitute Adopted | |
2010-07-01 | Reptd Fav Com Substitute | |
2010-06-22 | Ref To Com On Finance | |
2010-06-22 | Rec From House | |
2010-06-21 | Passed 3rd Reading | |
2010-06-17 | Passed 2nd Reading | |
2010-06-17 | Amend Adopted 3 | |
2010-06-17 | Amend Failed 2 | |
2010-06-17 | Amend Failed 1 | |
2010-06-16 | Placed On Cal For 6/17/2010 | |
2010-06-16 | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) | |
2010-06-16 | Reptd Fav Com Sub 2 | |
2010-06-10 | Re-ref Com On Finance | |
2010-06-10 | Reptd Fav Com Substitute | |
2010-05-26 | Ref to the Com on Commerce, Small Business, and Entrepreneurship, if favorable, Finance | |
2010-05-26 | Passed 1st Reading | |
2010-05-25 | Filed |