NC H198 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 10-6)
Status: Engrossed on April 16 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-05-20 - Re-ref to Judiciary. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

Human Trafficking Commission Recommendations.-AB

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Human Trafficking Commission Recommendations.-AB

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-15 - House - Second Reading (Y: 110 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 9) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-20SenateRe-ref to Judiciary. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate
2019-05-20SenateWithdrawn From Com
2019-04-16SenateRef To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
2019-04-16SenatePassed 1st Reading
2019-04-16SenateRegular Message Received From House
2019-04-16HouseRegular Message Sent To Senate
2019-04-15HousePassed 3rd Reading
2019-04-15HousePassed 2nd Reading
2019-04-11HousePlaced On Cal For 04/15/2019
2019-04-11HouseCal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
2019-04-11HouseReptd Fav Com Sub 2
2019-03-13HouseRe-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
2019-03-13HouseReptd Fav Com Substitute
2019-02-28HouseSerial Referral To Appropriations Stricken
2019-02-28HouseSerial Referral To Appropriations, Health and Human Services Stricken
2019-02-28HouseSerial Referral To Finance Stricken
2019-02-27HouseRef to the Com on Judiciary, if favorable, Finance, if favorable, Appropriations, Health and Human Services, if favorable, Appropriations, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
2019-02-27HousePassed 1st Reading
2019-02-26HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

S200 (Same As) 2019-05-02 - Re-ref Com On Appropriations/Base Budget

North Carolina State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback