NC H1998 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 1 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-07-01 - Ch. SL 2010-38
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 1 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-07-01 - Ch. SL 2010-38
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Reciprocity for ORP Service
Title
Reciprocity for ORP Service
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-06-24 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-07-01 | Ch. SL 2010-38 | |
2010-07-01 | Signed By Gov. 7/1/2010 | |
2010-06-29 | Pres. To Gov. 6/29/2010 | |
2010-06-28 | Ratified | |
2010-06-24 | Passed 2nd & 3rd Reading | |
2010-06-23 | Reptd Fav | |
2010-06-16 | Ref To Com On Pensions & Retirement & Aging | |
2010-06-16 | Rec From House | |
2010-06-15 | Passed 2nd & 3rd Reading | |
2010-06-14 | Placed On Cal For 6/15/2010 | |
2010-06-14 | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) | |
2010-06-14 | Withdrawn From Com | |
2010-06-09 | Re-ref Com On Appropriations | |
2010-06-09 | Reptd Fav | |
2010-05-26 | Ref to the Com on Pensions and Retirement, if favorable, Appropriations | |
2010-05-26 | Passed 1st Reading | |
2010-05-25 | Filed |