NC H2 | 2018 | 1st Special Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 4 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-04 - Ch. Res 2018-11
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Adjourn 2018 First Extra Session Sine Die

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Adjourn 2018 First Extra Session Sine Die

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-08-04 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 39 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2018-08-04 - House - Second Reading (Y: 107 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-08-04HouseCh. Res 2018-11
2018-08-04 Ratified
2018-08-04SenateOrdered Enrolled
2018-08-04SenatePassed 3rd Reading
2018-08-04SenatePassed 2nd Reading
2018-08-04SenatePlaced on Today's Calendar
2018-08-04SenatePassed 1st Reading
2018-08-04SenateSpecial Message Received From House
2018-08-04HouseSpecial Message Sent To Senate
2018-08-04HousePassed 3rd Reading
2018-08-04HousePassed 2nd Reading
2018-08-02HousePlaced On Cal For 08/04/2018
2018-08-02HouseCal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
2018-08-02HouseWithdrawn From Com
2018-07-24HouseRef To Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
2018-07-24HousePassed 1st Reading
2018-07-24HouseFiled

North Carolina State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback