NC H2015 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-1)
Status: Introduced on May 25 2010 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-07-01 - Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
Pending: House Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 25 2010 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-07-01 - Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
Pending: House Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Study Impact Of Toxins On Health
Title
Study Impact Of Toxins On Health
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-07-01 | Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House | |
2010-07-01 | Reptd Fav | |
2010-06-24 | Re-ref Com On Health | |
2010-06-24 | Reptd Fav Com Substitute | |
2010-05-26 | Ref to the Com on Environment and Natural Resources, if favorable, Health, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House | |
2010-05-26 | Passed 1st Reading | |
2010-05-25 | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S1416 (Same As) 2010-05-26 - Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate