NC H2042 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 6 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-07-06 - Ch. SL 2010-55
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 6 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-07-06 - Ch. SL 2010-55
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Sanford Property Transfer/King Taxes
Title
Sanford Property Transfer/King Taxes
Sponsors
Rep. Jimmy Love [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-07-06 | Ch. SL 2010-55 | |
2010-07-06 | Ratified | |
2010-07-01 | Concurred In S/Com Sub | |
2010-06-30 | Placed On Cal For 7/1/2010 | |
2010-06-30 | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) | |
2010-06-30 | Reptd Fav To Concur | |
2010-06-24 | Ref To Com On Local Government I | |
2010-06-24 | Rec To Concur S Com Sub | |
2010-06-23 | Passed 2nd & 3rd Reading | |
2010-06-22 | Com Substitute Adopted | |
2010-06-22 | Reptd Fav Com Substitute | |
2010-06-14 | Ref To Com On State and Local Government | |
2010-06-11 | Rec From House | |
2010-06-10 | Passed 2nd & 3rd Reading | |
2010-06-09 | Placed On Cal For 6/10/2010 | |
2010-06-09 | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) | |
2010-06-09 | Reptd Fav Com Substitute | |
2010-05-27 | Ref To Com On Local Government I | |
2010-05-27 | Passed 1st Reading | |
2010-05-26 | Filed |