NC H205 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on May 7 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-05-07 - Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
Pending: Senate Rules and Operations of the Senate Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

Veh. Property Dmg./Determining Amt. of Loss

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Veh. Property Dmg./Determining Amt. of Loss

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-07 - House - Second Reading (Y: 89 N: 27 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-07SenateRef To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
2019-05-07SenatePassed 1st Reading
2019-05-07SenateSpecial Message Received From House
2019-05-07HouseSpecial Message Sent To Senate
2019-05-07HousePassed 3rd Reading
2019-05-07HousePassed 2nd Reading
2019-05-06HousePlaced On Cal For 05/07/2019
2019-05-06HouseCal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
2019-05-06HouseReptd Fav Com Sub 3
2019-05-03HouseRe-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
2019-05-03HouseReptd Fav
2019-05-02HouseSerial Referral To Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House Added
2019-04-18HouseRe-ref Com On Judiciary
2019-04-18HouseReptd Fav
2019-04-11HouseRe-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
2019-04-11HouseReptd Fav Com Sub 2
2019-03-26HouseRe-ref Com On Insurance
2019-03-26HouseReptd Fav Com Substitute
2019-02-28HouseRef to the Com on Transportation, if favorable, Insurance, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
2019-02-28HousePassed 1st Reading
2019-02-26HouseFiled

North Carolina State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback