NC H2050 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on July 6 2010 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-07-06 - Ref To Com On State and Local Government
Pending: Senate State and Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on July 6 2010 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-07-06 - Ref To Com On State and Local Government
Pending: Senate State and Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Winston-Salem/Council Meetings
Title
Winston-Salem/Council Meetings
Sponsors
Rep. Larry Brown [R] | Rep. Sandra Hughes [D] | Rep. William McGee [R] | Sen. Earline Parmon [D] |
Rep. Larry Womble [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-07-06 | Ref To Com On State and Local Government | |
2010-07-06 | Rec From House | |
2010-07-06 | Passed 2nd & 3rd Reading | |
2010-07-01 | Placed On Cal For 7/6/2010 | |
2010-07-01 | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) | |
2010-07-01 | Reptd Fav | |
2010-06-09 | Re-ref Com On Judiciary II | |
2010-06-09 | Reptd Fav Com Substitute | |
2010-05-27 | Ref to the Com on Local Government I, if favorable, Judiciary II | |
2010-05-27 | Passed 1st Reading | |
2010-05-26 | Filed |