NC H2051 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on June 17 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-06-17 - Ch. Res 2010-11
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on June 17 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-06-17 - Ch. Res 2010-11
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Little Switzerland Centennial
Title
Little Switzerland Centennial
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-06-16 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-06-17 | Ch. Res 2010-11 | |
2010-06-17 | Ratified | |
2010-06-16 | Passed 2nd & 3rd Reading | |
2010-06-15 | Placed On Cal For 6/16/2010 | |
2010-06-15 | Withdrawn From Com | |
2010-06-03 | Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate | |
2010-06-03 | Rec From House | |
2010-06-02 | Passed 2nd & 3rd Reading | |
2010-06-01 | Placed On Cal For 6/2/2010 | |
2010-06-01 | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) | |
2010-06-01 | Reptd Fav | |
2010-05-27 | Ref To Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House | |
2010-05-27 | Passed 1st Reading | |
2010-05-26 | Filed |