NC H2052 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 7 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-07-07 - Ch. SL 2010-60
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 7 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-07-07 - Ch. SL 2010-60
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Winston-Salem/Assessments Exemption
Title
Winston-Salem/Assessments Exemption
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-07-06 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2010-07-01 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2010-07-01 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-07-07 | Ch. SL 2010-60 | |
2010-07-07 | Ratified | |
2010-07-06 | Passed 3rd Reading | |
2010-07-01 | Placed On Cal For 7/6/2010 | |
2010-07-01 | Passed 2nd Reading | |
2010-06-30 | Reptd Fav | |
2010-06-23 | Ref To Com On Finance | |
2010-06-23 | Rec From House | |
2010-06-23 | Passed 3rd Reading | |
2010-06-22 | Passed 2nd Reading | |
2010-06-21 | Placed On Cal For 6/22/2010 | |
2010-06-17 | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) | |
2010-06-17 | Reptd Fav | |
2010-06-09 | Re-ref Com On Finance | |
2010-06-09 | Reptd Fav | |
2010-05-27 | Ref to the Com on Local Government I, if favorable, Finance | |
2010-05-27 | Passed 1st Reading | |
2010-05-26 | Filed |