NC H2059 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Engrossed on July 6 2010 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-07-06 - Ref To Com On State and Local Government
Pending: Senate State and Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on July 6 2010 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-07-06 - Ref To Com On State and Local Government
Pending: Senate State and Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Winston-Salem/Informal Bids Electronically
Title
Winston-Salem/Informal Bids Electronically
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-07-06 | Ref To Com On State and Local Government | |
2010-07-06 | Rec From House | |
2010-07-06 | Passed 2nd & 3rd Reading | |
2010-07-01 | Placed On Cal For 7/6/2010 | |
2010-07-01 | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) | |
2010-07-01 | Reptd Fav | |
2010-06-09 | Re-ref Com On Judiciary II | |
2010-06-09 | Reptd Fav | |
2010-05-27 | Ref to the Com on Local Government I, if favorable, Judiciary II | |
2010-05-27 | Passed 1st Reading | |
2010-05-26 | Filed |