NC H206 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Engrossed on March 28 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-07-15 - Conf Com Appointed
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

Various Transportation Changes

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Various Transportation Changes

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-07-10 - House - M11 Not Concur (Y: 118 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-07-08 - Senate - Amendment 2 (Y: 48 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-07-08 - Senate - Amendment 3 (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-07-08 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 48 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-07-02 - Senate - Amendment 1 (Y: 43 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-07-02 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 42 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-03-27 - House - Second Reading (Y: 111 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-07-15SenateConf Com Appointed
2019-07-10HouseConf Com Appointed
2019-07-10HouseFailed Concur In S Com Sub
2019-07-09HousePlaced On Cal For 07/10/2019
2019-07-09HouseCal Pursuant 36(b)
2019-07-09HouseSpecial Message Received For Concurrence in S Com Sub
2019-07-09SenateSpecial Message Sent To House
2019-07-08SenateEngrossed
2019-07-08SenatePassed 3rd Reading
2019-07-08SenateAmend Adopted A3
2019-07-08SenateAmend Adopted A2
2019-07-02SenatePlaced On Cal For 07/08/2019
2019-07-02SenatePassed 2nd Reading
2019-07-02SenateAmend Adopted A1
2019-07-01SenateReptd Fav
2019-06-28SenateRe-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
2019-06-28SenateCom Substitute Adopted
2019-06-28SenateReptd Fav Com Substitute
2019-06-27SenateRe-ref to Finance. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate
2019-06-27SenateWithdrawn From Com
2019-06-26SenateRe-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
2019-06-26SenateCom Substitute Adopted
2019-06-26SenateReptd Fav Com Substitute
2019-06-12SenateRe-ref to Transportation. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate
2019-06-12SenateWithdrawn From Com
2019-03-28SenateRef To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
2019-03-28SenatePassed 1st Reading
2019-03-28SenateRegular Message Received From House
2019-03-28HouseRegular Message Sent To Senate
2019-03-27HousePassed 3rd Reading
2019-03-27HousePassed 2nd Reading
2019-03-25HousePlaced On Cal For 03/27/2019
2019-03-25HouseCal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
2019-03-25HouseReptd Fav
2019-03-18HouseRe-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
2019-03-18HouseReptd Fav Com Substitute
2019-03-12HouseRe-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
2019-03-12HouseReptd Fav
2019-02-28HouseRef to the Com on Transportation, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
2019-02-28HousePassed 1st Reading
2019-02-26HouseFiled

North Carolina State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.ncleg.gov/BillLookUp/2019/H206
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2019/Bills/House/PDF/H206v0.pdf
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2019/Bills/House/PDF/H206v1.pdf
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2019/Bills/House/PDF/H206v2.pdf
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2019/Bills/House/PDF/H206v3.pdf
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2019/Bills/House/PDF/H206v4.pdf
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2019/Bills/House/PDF/H206v5.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.ncleg.gov/Legislation/Votes/RollCallVoteTranscript/2019/H/89
Roll Callhttps://www.ncleg.gov/Legislation/Votes/RollCallVoteTranscript/2019/S/417
Roll Callhttps://www.ncleg.gov/Legislation/Votes/RollCallVoteTranscript/2019/S/416
Roll Callhttps://www.ncleg.gov/Legislation/Votes/RollCallVoteTranscript/2019/S/443
Roll Callhttps://www.ncleg.gov/Legislation/Votes/RollCallVoteTranscript/2019/S/442
Roll Callhttps://www.ncleg.gov/Legislation/Votes/RollCallVoteTranscript/2019/S/441
Roll Callhttps://www.ncleg.gov/Legislation/Votes/RollCallVoteTranscript/2019/H/622

Bill Comments

feedback