NC H2074 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 22 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-06-22 - Ch. Res 2010-13
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 22 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-06-22 - Ch. Res 2010-13
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Honor Hoyt Taylor, Sr. and Jr
Title
Honor Hoyt Taylor, Sr. and Jr
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-06-21 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-06-22 | Ch. Res 2010-13 | |
2010-06-22 | Ratified | |
2010-06-21 | Passed 2nd & 3rd Reading | |
2010-06-21 | Placed On Cal For 6/21/2010 | |
2010-06-21 | Rec From House | |
2010-06-21 | Passed 2nd & 3rd Reading | |
2010-06-17 | Placed On Cal For 6/21/2010 | |
2010-06-17 | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) | |
2010-06-17 | Reptd Fav Com Substitute | |
2010-06-14 | Ref To Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House | |
2010-06-14 | Passed 1st Reading | |
2010-06-09 | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S1453 (Same As) 2010-06-09 - Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate