NC H2076 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-3)
Status: Passed on July 6 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-07-06 - Ch. Res 2010-23
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-3)
Status: Passed on July 6 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-07-06 - Ch. Res 2010-23
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Honor ADA 20th Anniversary
Title
Honor ADA 20th Anniversary
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-07-01 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-07-06 | Ch. Res 2010-23 | |
2010-07-06 | Ratified | |
2010-07-01 | Passed 2nd & 3rd Reading | |
2010-06-30 | Placed On Cal For 7/1/2010 | |
2010-06-30 | Withdrawn From Cal | |
2010-06-28 | Placed On Cal For 6/30/2010 | |
2010-06-28 | Withdrawn From Com | |
2010-06-28 | Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate | |
2010-06-24 | Rec From House | |
2010-06-24 | Passed 2nd & 3rd Reading | |
2010-06-23 | Placed On Cal For 6/24/2010 | |
2010-06-23 | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) | |
2010-06-23 | Reptd Fav | |
2010-06-17 | Ref To Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House | |
2010-06-17 | Passed 1st Reading | |
2010-06-15 | Filed |