NC H2078 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 7 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-07-07 - Ch. Res 2010-24
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 7 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-07-07 - Ch. Res 2010-24
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Honoring 100th Anniversary of Scouting
Title
Honoring 100th Anniversary of Scouting
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-07-06 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-07-07 | Ch. Res 2010-24 | |
2010-07-07 | Ratified | |
2010-07-06 | Passed 2nd & 3rd Reading | |
2010-07-01 | Placed On Cal For 7/6/2010 | |
2010-07-01 | Rec From House | |
2010-07-01 | Passed 2nd & 3rd Reading | |
2010-06-30 | Placed On Cal For 7/1/2010 | |
2010-06-29 | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) | |
2010-06-29 | Reptd Fav | |
2010-06-22 | Ref To Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House | |
2010-06-22 | Passed 1st Reading | |
2010-06-21 | Filed |