NC H2082 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 9 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-07-09 - Ch. Res 2010-29
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 9 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-07-09 - Ch. Res 2010-29
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Recognize YMCA Camping
Title
Recognize YMCA Camping
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-07-08 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-07-09 | Ch. Res 2010-29 | |
2010-07-09 | Ratified | |
2010-07-08 | Passed 2nd & 3rd Reading | |
2010-07-08 | Placed On Cal For 7/8/2010 | |
2010-07-08 | Passed 1st Reading | |
2010-07-08 | Rec From House | |
2010-07-08 | Passed 2nd & 3rd Reading | |
2010-07-07 | Placed On Cal For 7/8/2010 | |
2010-07-07 | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) | |
2010-07-07 | Withdrawn From Com | |
2010-07-06 | Ref To Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House | |
2010-07-06 | Passed 1st Reading | |
2010-06-30 | Filed |