NC H21 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 15 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-24 - Re-ref to Redistricting and Elections. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate
Pending: Senate Redistricting and Elections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 15 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-24 - Re-ref to Redistricting and Elections. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate
Pending: Senate Redistricting and Elections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Revise McDowell County Bd of Educ. Districts
Title
Revise McDowell County Bd of Educ. Districts
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-24 | Senate | Re-ref to Redistricting and Elections. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2019-05-24 | Senate | Withdrawn From Com |
2019-04-15 | Senate | Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2019-04-15 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2019-04-15 | Senate | Regular Message Received From House |
2019-04-12 | House | Regular Message Sent To Senate |
2019-04-11 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2019-04-11 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2019-04-10 | House | Placed On Cal For 04/11/2019 |
2019-04-10 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2019-04-10 | House | Reptd Fav |
2019-04-10 | House | Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2019-04-10 | House | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2019-02-20 | House | Re-ref Com On Elections and Ethics Law |
2019-02-20 | House | Reptd Fav |
2019-02-06 | House | Ref to the Com on State and Local Government, if favorable, Elections and Ethics Law, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2019-02-06 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2019-02-05 | House | Filed |