NC H224 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 26-4)
Status: Passed on July 11 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-11 - Ch. SL 2019-116
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Assault w/ Firearm on LEO/Increase Punishment

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Assault w/ Firearm on LEO/Increase Punishment

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-27 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-13 - House - Second Reading (Y: 116 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-07-11 Ch. SL 2019-116
2019-07-11 Signed by Gov. 7/11/2019
2019-07-01 Pres. To Gov. 7/1/2019
2019-06-28 Ratified
2019-06-27SenateOrdered Enrolled
2019-06-27SenatePassed 3rd Reading
2019-06-27SenatePassed 2nd Reading
2019-06-26SenateReptd Fav
2019-06-25SenateRe-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
2019-06-25SenateReptd Fav
2019-06-13SenateRe-ref to Judiciary. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate
2019-06-13SenateWithdrawn From Com
2019-03-14SenateRef To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
2019-03-14SenatePassed 1st Reading
2019-03-14SenateRegular Message Received From House
2019-03-14HouseRegular Message Sent To Senate
2019-03-13HousePassed 3rd Reading
2019-03-13HousePassed 2nd Reading
2019-03-11HousePlaced On Cal For 03/13/2019
2019-03-11HouseCal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
2019-03-11HouseReptd Fav
2019-03-06HouseRe-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
2019-03-06HouseReptd Fav Com Substitute
2019-02-28HouseRef to the Com on Judiciary, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
2019-02-28HousePassed 1st Reading
2019-02-27HouseFiled

North Carolina State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback