NC H225 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Introduced on February 27 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-02 - Re-ref Com On Judiciary
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 27 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-02 - Re-ref Com On Judiciary
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Protect Governmental Accountability
Title
Protect Governmental Accountability
Sponsors
Rep. Destin Hall [R] | Rep. Robert Davis [R] | Rep. Sarah Stevens [R] | Rep. George Cleveland [R] |
Rep. Dennis Riddell [R] | Rep. Harry Warren [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-02 | House | Re-ref Com On Judiciary |
2019-05-02 | House | Reptd Fav |
2019-02-28 | House | Ref to the Com on State and Local Government, if favorable, Judiciary, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2019-02-28 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2019-02-27 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S127 (Same As) 2019-07-04 - Ch. SL 2019-80
North Carolina State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ncleg.gov/BillLookUp/2019/H225 |
Text | https://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2019/Bills/House/PDF/H225v0.pdf |
Text | https://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2019/Bills/House/PDF/H225v1.pdf |