NC H226 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on August 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-30 - Ch. SL 2019-209
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Pay Increases/State Employees

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Pay Increases/State Employees

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-08-28 - House - C RPT Adoption (Y: 114 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-08-27 - Senate - Conference Rpt Motion 8 To Adopt (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-08-19 - House - M11 Not Concur (Y: 120 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-08-13 - Senate - Amendment 1 (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2019-08-13 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2019-04-11 - House - Second Reading (Y: 109 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 10) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-08-30 Ch. SL 2019-209
2019-08-30 Signed by Gov. 8/30/2019
2019-08-28 Pres. To Gov. 8/28/2019
2019-08-28 Ratified
2019-08-28HouseOrdered Enrolled
2019-08-28HouseConf Report Adopted
2019-08-27SenateConf Report Adopted
2019-08-27HousePlaced On Cal For 08/28/2019
2019-08-27HouseCal Pursuant Rule 44(d)
2019-08-27HouseReptd Fav For Adoption
2019-08-26SenatePlaced On Cal For 08/27/2019
2019-08-26SenateConf Com Reported
2019-08-26HouseRe-ref Com On Appropriations
2019-08-26HouseRule 44b
2019-08-26HouseConf Com Reported
2019-08-20SenateConf Com Appointed
2019-08-19HouseConf Com Appointed
2019-08-19HouseFailed Concur In S Com Sub
2019-08-19HouseAdded to Calendar
2019-08-19HouseWithdrawn From Com
2019-08-14HouseRe-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
2019-08-14HouseWithdrawn From Cal
2019-08-14HouseCal Pursuant 36(b)
2019-08-13HouseSpecial Message Received For Concurrence in S Com Sub
2019-08-13SenateSpecial Message Sent To House
2019-08-13SenateEngrossed
2019-08-13SenatePassed 3rd Reading
2019-08-13SenatePassed 2nd Reading
2019-08-13SenateAmend Adopted A1
2019-08-07SenatePlaced On Cal For 08/09/2019
2019-08-07SenateWithdrawn From Cal
2019-08-06SenatePlaced On Cal For 08/07/2019
2019-08-06SenateWithdrawn From Cal
2019-07-24SenatePlaced On Cal For 07/25/2019
2019-07-24SenateWithdrawn From Cal
2019-07-23SenatePlaced On Cal For 07/24/2019
2019-07-23SenateWithdrawn From Cal
2019-07-22SenatePlaced On Cal For 07/23/2019
2019-07-22SenateWithdrawn From Cal
2019-07-16SenatePlaced On Cal For 07/22/2019
2019-07-16SenateWithdrawn From Cal
2019-07-15SenatePlaced On Cal For 07/16/2019
2019-07-15SenateWithdrawn From Cal
2019-07-10SenatePlaced On Cal For 07/15/2019
2019-07-10SenateWithdrawn From Cal
2019-07-09SenatePlaced On Cal For 07/10/2019
2019-07-09SenateWithdrawn From Cal
2019-07-08SenatePlaced On Cal For 07/09/2019
2019-07-08SenateWithdrawn From Cal
2019-07-02SenatePlaced On Cal For 07/08/2019
2019-07-02SenateWithdrawn From Cal
2019-07-01SenatePlaced On Cal For 07/02/2019
2019-07-01SenateWithdrawn From Cal
2019-06-28SenateReptd Fav
2019-06-27SenateRe-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
2019-06-27SenateCom Substitute Adopted
2019-06-27SenateReptd Fav Com Substitute
2019-06-26SenateRe-ref Com On Finance
2019-06-26SenateCom Substitute Adopted
2019-06-26SenateReptd Fav Com Substitute
2019-06-20SenateRe-ref to Judiciary. If fav, re-ref to Finance. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate
2019-06-20SenateWithdrawn From Com
2019-04-15SenateRef To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
2019-04-15SenatePassed 1st Reading
2019-04-15SenateRegular Message Received From House
2019-04-12HouseRegular Message Sent To Senate
2019-04-11HousePassed 3rd Reading
2019-04-11HousePassed 2nd Reading
2019-04-10HousePlaced On Cal For 04/11/2019
2019-04-10HouseCal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
2019-04-10HouseReptd Fav
2019-03-20HouseRe-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
2019-03-20HouseReptd Fav Com Sub 2
2019-03-13HouseRe-ref Com On Finance
2019-03-13HouseReptd Fav Com Substitute
2019-02-28HouseRef to the Com on Judiciary, if favorable, Finance, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
2019-02-28HousePassed 1st Reading
2019-02-27HouseFiled

North Carolina State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.ncleg.gov/BillLookUp/2019/H226
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2019/Bills/House/PDF/H226v0.pdf
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2019/Bills/House/PDF/H226v1.pdf
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2019/Bills/House/PDF/H226v2.pdf
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2019/Bills/House/PDF/H226v3.pdf
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2019/Bills/House/PDF/H226v4.pdf
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2019/Bills/House/PDF/H226v5.pdf
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2019/Bills/House/PDF/H226v6.pdf
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2019/Bills/House/PDF/H226v7.pdf
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2019/Bills/House/PDF/H226v8.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.ncleg.gov/Legislation/Votes/RollCallVoteTranscript/2019/H/147
Roll Callhttps://www.ncleg.gov/Legislation/Votes/RollCallVoteTranscript/2019/S/552
Roll Callhttps://www.ncleg.gov/Legislation/Votes/RollCallVoteTranscript/2019/S/551
Roll Callhttps://www.ncleg.gov/Legislation/Votes/RollCallVoteTranscript/2019/H/761
Roll Callhttps://www.ncleg.gov/Legislation/Votes/RollCallVoteTranscript/2019/S/572
Roll Callhttps://www.ncleg.gov/Legislation/Votes/RollCallVoteTranscript/2019/H/796

Bill Comments

feedback