NC H231 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Vetoed on November 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-11-13 - Ref To Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
Pending: House Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Vetoed on November 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-11-13 - Ref To Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
Pending: House Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
UNC & Comm. Coll. Pay/Retiree Bonus
Title
UNC & Comm. Coll. Pay/Retiree Bonus
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-10-30 - House - M11 Concur (Y: 61 N: 49 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2019-10-24 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 27 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-07-30 - House - Second Reading (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2019-10-24 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 27 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-07-30 - House - Second Reading (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 14) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-11-13 | House | Ref To Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2019-11-08 | House | Received from the Governor |
2019-11-08 | Vetoed 11/08/2019 | |
2019-11-01 | Pres. To Gov. 11/1/2019 | |
2019-10-31 | Ratified | |
2019-10-30 | House | Ordered Enrolled |
2019-10-30 | House | Concurred In S Com Sub |
2019-10-29 | House | Placed On Cal For 10/30/2019 |
2019-10-29 | House | Cal Pursuant 36(b) |
2019-10-28 | House | Regular Message Received For Concurrence in S Com Sub |
2019-10-28 | Senate | Regular Message Sent To House |
2019-10-24 | Senate | Passed 3rd Reading |
2019-10-24 | Senate | Passed 2nd Reading |
2019-10-23 | Senate | Com Substitute Adopted |
2019-10-23 | Senate | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2019-10-23 | Senate | Re-ref Com On Pensions and Retirement and Aging |
2019-10-23 | Senate | Com Substitute Adopted |
2019-10-23 | Senate | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2019-10-17 | Senate | Re-ref Com On Appropriations/Base Budget |
2019-10-17 | Senate | Withdrawn From Com |
2019-08-01 | Senate | Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2019-08-01 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2019-08-01 | Senate | Regular Message Received From House |
2019-07-31 | House | Regular Message Sent To Senate |
2019-07-30 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2019-07-30 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2019-07-29 | House | Placed On Cal For 07/30/2019 |
2019-07-24 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2019-07-24 | House | Serial Referral To Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House Stricken |
2019-07-24 | House | Reptd Fav |
2019-07-23 | House | Re-ref to the Com on Appropriations, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2019-07-23 | House | Serial Referral To Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House Stricken |
2019-07-23 | House | Serial Referral To Judiciary Stricken |
2019-07-23 | House | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2019-03-04 | House | Ref to the Com on Education - Universities, if favorable, Judiciary, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2019-03-04 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2019-02-27 | House | Filed |