NC H235 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Engrossed on June 10 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-07-11 - Re-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
Pending: Senate Rules and Operations of the Senate Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on June 10 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-07-11 - Re-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
Pending: Senate Rules and Operations of the Senate Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Utilities Comm'n Tech. and Add'l Changes.-AB
Title
Utilities Comm'n Tech. and Add'l Changes.-AB
Sponsors
Rep. Dean Arp [R] | Rep. John Szoka [R] | Rep. Brenden Jones [R] | Rep. Michael Wray [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-06-05 - House - Second Reading (Y: 116 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-07-11 | Senate | Re-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2019-07-11 | Senate | Withdrawn From Cal |
2019-07-10 | Senate | Placed On Cal For 07/15/2019 |
2019-07-10 | Senate | Withdrawn From Cal |
2019-07-09 | Senate | Placed On Cal For 07/10/2019 |
2019-07-09 | Senate | Withdrawn From Cal |
2019-07-08 | Senate | Placed On Cal For 07/09/2019 |
2019-07-08 | Senate | Withdrawn From Cal |
2019-07-02 | Senate | Placed On Cal For 07/08/2019 |
2019-07-02 | Senate | Withdrawn From Cal |
2019-07-01 | Senate | Reptd Fav |
2019-06-26 | Senate | Re-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2019-06-26 | Senate | Com Substitute Adopted |
2019-06-26 | Senate | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2019-06-21 | Senate | Re-ref to Agriculture/Environment/Natural Resources. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2019-06-21 | Senate | Withdrawn From Com |
2019-06-10 | Senate | Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2019-06-10 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2019-06-10 | Senate | Regular Message Received From House |
2019-06-06 | House | Regular Message Sent To Senate |
2019-06-05 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2019-06-05 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2019-06-04 | House | Placed On Cal For 06/05/2019 |
2019-06-04 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2019-06-04 | House | Reptd Fav |
2019-05-29 | House | Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2019-05-29 | House | Reptd Fav Com Sub 2 |
2019-03-19 | House | Re-ref Com On Finance |
2019-03-19 | House | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2019-03-04 | House | Ref to the Com on Energy and Public Utilities, if favorable, Finance, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2019-03-04 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2019-02-27 | House | Filed |