NC H241 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 51-11)
Status: Engrossed on March 18 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-03-18 - Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
Pending: Senate Rules and Operations of the Senate Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

Education Bond Act of 2019

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Education Bond Act of 2019

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-14 - House - Third Reading (Y: 99 N: 6 NV: 1 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2019-03-13 - House - Motion 12/ Appeal Ruling of Chair Second Reading (Y: 7 N: 107 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [FAIL]
2019-03-13 - House - Second Reading (Y: 109 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-18SenateRef To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
2019-03-18SenatePassed 1st Reading
2019-03-18SenateRegular Message Received From House
2019-03-15HouseRegular Message Sent To Senate
2019-03-14HousePassed 3rd Reading
2019-03-13HousePassed 2nd Reading
2019-03-11HousePlaced On Cal For 03/13/2019
2019-03-11HouseCal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
2019-03-11HouseReptd Fav Com Sub 2
2019-03-07HouseRe-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
2019-03-07HouseWithdrawn From Cal
2019-03-06HousePlaced On Cal For 03/13/2019
2019-03-06HouseCal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
2019-03-06HouseReptd Fav
2019-03-06HouseRe-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
2019-03-06HouseReptd Fav
2019-03-06HouseRe-ref Com On Appropriations, Capital
2019-03-06HouseReptd Fav
2019-03-05HouseRe-ref Com On Finance
2019-03-05HouseReptd Fav Com Substitute
2019-03-04HouseRef to the Com on Education - K-12, if favorable, Finance, if favorable, Appropriations, Capital, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
2019-03-04HousePassed 1st Reading
2019-02-28HouseFiled

North Carolina State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback