NC H243 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 47-28)
Status: Passed on June 29 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-29 - Ch. SL 2017-74
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 47-28)
Status: Passed on June 29 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-29 - Ch. SL 2017-74
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Strengthen Opioid Misuse Prevention (STOP)Act
Title
Strengthen Opioid Misuse Prevention (STOP)Act
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-06-27 - House - M11 Concur (Y: 118 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-06-21 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-21 - Senate - Amendment 1 (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-10 - House - Second Reading (Y: 114 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2017-04-10 - House - A3 Adcock Second Reading (Y: 39 N: 74 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [FAIL]
2017-04-10 - House - A2 Adcock Second Reading (Y: 113 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2017-04-10 - House - A1 Murphy Second Reading (Y: 111 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2017-06-21 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-21 - Senate - Amendment 1 (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-10 - House - Second Reading (Y: 114 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2017-04-10 - House - A3 Adcock Second Reading (Y: 39 N: 74 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [FAIL]
2017-04-10 - House - A2 Adcock Second Reading (Y: 113 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2017-04-10 - House - A1 Murphy Second Reading (Y: 111 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-29 | Ch. SL 2017-74 | |
2017-06-29 | Signed by Gov. 6/29/2017 | |
2017-06-28 | Pres. To Gov. 6/28/2017 | |
2017-06-28 | Ratified | |
2017-06-27 | House | Ordered Enrolled |
2017-06-27 | House | Concurred In S/Com Sub |
2017-06-26 | House | Placed On Cal For 06/27/2017 |
2017-06-26 | House | Withdrawn From Cal |
2017-06-26 | House | Added to Calendar |
2017-06-26 | House | Cal Pursuant 36(b) |
2017-06-22 | House | Regular Message Received For Concurrence in S Com Sub |
2017-06-22 | Senate | Regular Message Sent To House |
2017-06-21 | Senate | Engrossed |
2017-06-21 | Senate | Passed 3rd Reading |
2017-06-21 | Senate | Passed 2nd Reading |
2017-06-21 | Senate | Amend Adopted A1 |
2017-06-20 | Senate | Reptd Fav |
2017-06-15 | Senate | Re-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2017-06-15 | Senate | Com Substitute Adopted |
2017-06-15 | Senate | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2017-06-01 | Senate | Re-ref to Health Care. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2017-06-01 | Senate | Withdrawn From Com |
2017-04-11 | Senate | Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2017-04-11 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2017-04-11 | Senate | Regular Message Received From House |
2017-04-11 | House | Regular Message Sent To Senate |
2017-04-10 | House | Ordered Engrossed |
2017-04-10 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2017-04-10 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2017-04-10 | House | Amend Failed A3 |
2017-04-10 | House | Amend Adopted A2 |
2017-04-10 | House | Amend Adopted A1 |
2017-04-06 | House | Placed On Cal For 04/10/2017 |
2017-04-06 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2017-04-06 | House | Withdrawn From Com |
2017-03-30 | House | Re-ref Com On Appropriations |
2017-03-30 | House | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2017-03-06 | House | Ref to the Com on Health, if favorable, Appropriations |
2017-03-06 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2017-03-02 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S175 (Same As) 2017-03-07 - Re-ref to Health Care. If fav, re-ref to Judiciary. If fav, re-ref to Appropriations/Base Budget. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate