NC H244 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Introduced on February 28 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-03 - Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
Pending: House Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 28 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-03 - Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
Pending: House Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Contractor/Subcontractor Compliance
Title
Contractor/Subcontractor Compliance
Sponsors
Rep. George Cleveland [R] | Rep. Debra Conrad [R] | Rep. Destin Hall [R] | Rep. Cody Henson [R] |
Rep. Dennis Riddell [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-03 | House | Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2019-05-03 | House | Withdrawn From Com |
2019-04-25 | House | Re-ref Com On Commerce |
2019-04-25 | House | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2019-03-04 | House | Ref to the Com on State and Local Government, if favorable, Commerce, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2019-03-04 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2019-02-28 | House | Filed |