NC H257 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 11 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-11 - Ch. SL 2019-115
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Motorcycles/Face Masks

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Motorcycles/Face Masks

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-27 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-27 - House - A1 Logan Second Reading (Y: 108 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2019-03-27 - House - Second Reading (Y: 111 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-07-11 Ch. SL 2019-115
2019-07-11 Signed by Gov. 7/11/2019
2019-07-01 Pres. To Gov. 7/1/2019
2019-06-28 Ratified
2019-06-27SenateOrdered Enrolled
2019-06-27SenatePassed 3rd Reading
2019-06-27SenatePassed 2nd Reading
2019-06-26SenateReptd Fav
2019-06-25SenateRe-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
2019-06-25SenateReptd Fav
2019-06-14SenateRe-ref to Judiciary. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate
2019-06-14SenateWithdrawn From Com
2019-03-28SenateRef To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
2019-03-28SenatePassed 1st Reading
2019-03-28SenateRegular Message Received From House
2019-03-28HouseRegular Message Sent To Senate
2019-03-27HouseOrdered Engrossed
2019-03-27HousePassed 3rd Reading
2019-03-27HousePassed 2nd Reading
2019-03-27HouseAmend Adopted A1
2019-03-25HousePlaced On Cal For 03/27/2019
2019-03-25HouseCal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
2019-03-25HouseReptd Fav
2019-03-19HouseRe-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
2019-03-19HouseReptd Fav
2019-03-05HouseRef to the Com on Transportation, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
2019-03-05HousePassed 1st Reading
2019-03-04HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

S321 (Same As) 2019-05-07 - Ref To Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House

North Carolina State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback