NC H263 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 4 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-04 - Ch. SL 2019-11
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Fill Vacancies/Modify 2018 Appointments

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Fill Vacancies/Modify 2018 Appointments

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-03 - House - M11 Concur Sen. Amd. 1 (Y: 111 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-03-25 - Senate - Amendment 1 (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-03-25 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-03-13 - House - Second Reading (Y: 114 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-04 Ch. SL 2019-11
2019-04-04 Ratified
2019-04-03HouseOrdered Enrolled
2019-04-03HouseConcurred In S Amend SA1
2019-04-01HousePlaced On Cal For 04/03/2019
2019-04-01HouseWithdrawn From Com
2019-03-27HouseRef To Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
2019-03-26HouseRegular Message Received For Concurrence in S Amend
2019-03-26SenateRegular Message Sent To House
2019-03-25SenatePassed 3rd Reading
2019-03-25SenatePassed 2nd Reading
2019-03-25SenateAmend Adopted A1
2019-03-21SenateReptd Fav
2019-03-14SenateRef To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
2019-03-14SenatePassed 1st Reading
2019-03-14SenateRegular Message Received From House
2019-03-14HouseRegular Message Sent To Senate
2019-03-13HousePassed 3rd Reading
2019-03-13HousePassed 2nd Reading
2019-03-11HousePlaced On Cal For 03/13/2019
2019-03-11HouseCal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
2019-03-11HouseReptd Fav
2019-03-05HouseRef To Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
2019-03-05HousePassed 1st Reading
2019-03-04HouseFiled

North Carolina State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback