NC H265 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-2-1)
Status: Passed on March 13 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-13 - Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Amend House Permanent Rules - April Meetings

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Amend House Permanent Rules - April Meetings

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-13 - House - R2 For Adoption (Y: 116 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-13HouseAdopted
2019-03-11HousePlaced On Cal For 03/13/2019
2019-03-11HouseCal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
2019-03-11HouseReptd Fav For Adoption
2019-03-05HouseRef To Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
2019-03-05HousePassed 1st Reading
2019-03-04HouseFiled
2019-03-04HouseReptd Fav. For Introduction

North Carolina State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback