NC H271 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 8-1)
Status: Passed on June 23 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-23 - Ch. SL 2011-243
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 8-1)
Status: Passed on June 23 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-23 - Ch. SL 2011-243
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Probation Officer/No Concealed Carry Required
Title
Probation Officer/No Concealed Carry Required
Sponsors
Rep. Justin Burr [R] | Sen. William Cook [R] | Rep. John Faircloth [R] | Rep. Bill Faison [D] |
Rep. David Guice [R] | Rep. Mark Hilton [R] | Rep. Dwight Horn [R] | Rep. Dan Ingle [R] |
Sen. Norman Sanderson [R] |
Roll Calls
2011-06-15 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 45 N: 3 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-12 - House - Second Reading (Y: 107 N: 9 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2011-05-12 - House - Second Reading (Y: 107 N: 9 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-06-23 | Ch. SL 2011-243 | |
2011-06-23 | Signed By Gov. 6/23/2011 | |
2011-06-17 | Pres. To Gov. 6/17/2011 | |
2011-06-16 | Ratified | |
2011-06-15 | Passed 2nd & 3rd Reading | |
2011-06-15 | Placed On Cal For 6/15/2011 | |
2011-06-15 | Reptd Fav | |
2011-05-16 | Ref To Com On Judiciary II | |
2011-05-16 | Passed 1st Reading | |
2011-05-13 | Rec From House | |
2011-05-12 | Passed 2nd & 3rd Reading | |
2011-05-11 | Placed On Cal For 5/12/2011 | |
2011-05-11 | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) | |
2011-05-11 | Reptd Fav | |
2011-04-11 | Re-ref Com On Judiciary Subcommittee C | |
2011-04-11 | Withdrawn From Com | |
2011-03-10 | Ref To Com On Judiciary Subcommittee A | |
2011-03-10 | Passed 1st Reading | |
2011-03-08 | Filed |