NC H272 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 10-3)
Status: Passed on August 6 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-08-06 - Ch. SL 2014-108
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 10-3)
Status: Passed on August 6 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-08-06 - Ch. SL 2014-108
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
DOT/DMV Changes #2
Title
DOT/DMV Changes #2
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-08-01 - House - C RPT Adoption (Y: 110 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2014-07-31 - Senate - Conference Rpt Motion 8 To Adopt (Y: 43 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2014-07-31 - House - M11 Not Concur (Y: 112 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2014-07-29 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2013-04-17 - House - Second Reading (Y: 110 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2013-04-17 - House - A1 Stam Second Reading (Y: 111 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2014-07-31 - Senate - Conference Rpt Motion 8 To Adopt (Y: 43 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2014-07-31 - House - M11 Not Concur (Y: 112 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2014-07-29 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2013-04-17 - House - Second Reading (Y: 110 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2013-04-17 - House - A1 Stam Second Reading (Y: 111 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-08-06 | Ch. SL 2014-108 | |
2014-08-06 | Signed by Gov. 8/6/2014 | |
2014-08-02 | Pres. To Gov. 8/2/2014 | |
2014-08-02 | Ratified | |
2014-08-01 | House | Ordered Enrolled |
2014-08-01 | House | Conf Report Adopted |
2014-07-31 | Senate | Conf Report Adopted |
2014-07-31 | Senate | Placed on Today's Calendar |
2014-07-31 | Senate | Conf Com Reported |
2014-07-31 | House | Placed On Cal For 08/01/2014 |
2014-07-31 | House | Conf Com Reported |
2014-07-31 | House | Conferees Changed |
2014-07-31 | Senate | Conf Com Appointed |
2014-07-31 | House | Conf Com Appointed |
2014-07-31 | House | Failed Concur In S Com Sub |
2014-07-31 | House | Added to Calendar |
2014-07-31 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2014-07-31 | House | Reptd Unfav For Conc |
2014-07-30 | House | Ref To Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2014-07-30 | House | Special Message Received For Concurrence in S Com Sub |
2014-07-29 | Senate | Special Message Sent To House |
2014-07-29 | Senate | Passed 3rd Reading |
2014-07-29 | Senate | Passed 2nd Reading |
2014-07-29 | Senate | Placed on Today's Calendar |
2014-07-29 | Senate | Com Substitute Adopted |
2014-07-29 | Senate | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2014-07-28 | Senate | Re-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2014-07-28 | Senate | Withdrawn From Com |
2014-07-28 | Senate | Sequential Referral To Judiciary II Stricken |
2013-04-18 | Senate | Ref to Transportation. If fav, re-ref to Judiciary II |
2013-04-18 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2013-04-18 | Senate | Rec From House |
2013-04-17 | House | Ordered Engrossed |
2013-04-17 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2013-04-17 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2013-04-17 | House | Amend Adopted A1 |
2013-04-16 | House | Placed On Cal For 04/17/2013 |
2013-04-16 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2013-04-16 | House | Reptd Fav Com Sub 2 |
2013-04-04 | House | Re-ref Com On Transportation |
2013-04-04 | House | Reptd Fav Com Sub 1 |
2013-03-12 | House | Ref to the Com on Judiciary Subcommittee B, if favorable, Transportation |
2013-03-12 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2013-03-11 | House | Filed |