NC H274 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on May 6 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-06 - Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
Pending: Senate Rules and Operations of the Senate Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on May 6 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-06 - Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
Pending: Senate Rules and Operations of the Senate Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Child Abuse & Neglect/Military Affiliation
Title
Child Abuse & Neglect/Military Affiliation
Sponsors
Rep. Holly Grange [R] | Rep. Larry Potts [R] | Rep. Donna White [R] | Sen. Gale Adcock [D] |
Rep. Johnnie Autry [D] | Rep. Mary Harrison [D] | Rep. Cody Henson [R] | Rep. Verla Insko [D] |
Rep. Joe John [D] | Rep. David Martin [D] | Rep. Allen McNeill [R] | Rep. Amos Quick [D] |
Rep. Raymond Smith [D] | Rep. John Szoka [R] | Rep. Shelly Willingham [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-05-02 - House - Second Reading (Y: 115 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-06 | Senate | Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2019-05-06 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2019-05-06 | Senate | Regular Message Received From House |
2019-05-03 | House | Regular Message Sent To Senate |
2019-05-02 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2019-05-02 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2019-05-01 | House | Placed On Cal For 05/02/2019 |
2019-05-01 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2019-05-01 | House | Reptd Fav |
2019-04-30 | House | Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2019-04-30 | House | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2019-04-25 | House | Serial Referral To Judiciary Stricken |
2019-03-06 | House | Ref to the Com on Homeland Security, Military, and Veterans Affairs, if favorable, Judiciary, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2019-03-06 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2019-03-05 | House | Filed |