NC H283 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 17-5)
Status: Passed on October 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-10-09 - Ch. SL 2019-228
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Conner’s Law

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Conner’s Law

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-10-02 - House - M11 Concur Sen. Amd. 1 (Y: 103 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2019-09-10 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-08-28 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-08-28 - Senate - Amendment 1 (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-03-20 - House - Second Reading (Y: 119 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-10-09 Ch. SL 2019-228
2019-10-09 Signed by Gov. 10/9/2019
2019-10-04 Pres. To Gov. 10/4/2019
2019-10-03 Ratified
2019-10-02HouseOrdered Enrolled
2019-10-02HouseConcurred In S Amend SA1
2019-10-01HousePlaced On Cal For 10/02/2019
2019-09-27HouseCal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
2019-09-27HouseWithdrawn From Com
2019-09-27HouseRe-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
2019-09-27HouseWithdrawn From Cal
2019-09-17HouseCal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
2019-09-17HouseWithdrawn From Com
2019-09-17HouseRe-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
2019-09-17HouseWithdrawn From Cal
2019-09-12HouseCal Pursuant 36(b)
2019-09-11HouseRegular Message Received For Concurrence in S Amend
2019-09-11SenateRegular Message Sent To House
2019-09-10SenatePassed 3rd Reading
2019-08-28SenatePassed 2nd Reading
2019-08-28SenateAmend Adopted A1
2019-08-27SenatePlaced On Cal For 08/28/2019
2019-08-27SenateWithdrawn From Cal
2019-08-26SenatePlaced On Cal For 08/27/2019
2019-08-26SenateWithdrawn From Cal
2019-08-21SenatePlaced On Cal For 08/26/2019
2019-08-21SenateWithdrawn From Cal
2019-08-20SenatePlaced On Cal For 08/21/2019
2019-08-20SenateWithdrawn From Cal
2019-08-13SenatePlaced On Cal For 08/14/2019
2019-08-13SenateWithdrawn From Cal
2019-08-07SenatePlaced On Cal For 08/09/2019
2019-08-07SenateWithdrawn From Cal
2019-08-06SenatePlaced On Cal For 08/07/2019
2019-08-06SenateWithdrawn From Cal
2019-07-24SenatePlaced On Cal For 07/25/2019
2019-07-24SenateWithdrawn From Cal
2019-07-23SenatePlaced On Cal For 07/24/2019
2019-07-23SenateWithdrawn From Cal
2019-07-22SenatePlaced On Cal For 07/23/2019
2019-07-22SenateWithdrawn From Cal
2019-07-16SenatePlaced On Cal For 07/22/2019
2019-07-16SenateWithdrawn From Cal
2019-07-15SenatePlaced On Cal For 07/16/2019
2019-07-15SenateWithdrawn From Cal
2019-07-10SenatePlaced On Cal For 07/15/2019
2019-07-10SenateWithdrawn From Cal
2019-07-09SenatePlaced On Cal For 07/10/2019
2019-07-09SenateWithdrawn From Cal
2019-07-08SenatePlaced On Cal For 07/09/2019
2019-07-08SenateWithdrawn From Cal
2019-07-02SenatePlaced On Cal For 07/08/2019
2019-07-02SenateWithdrawn From Cal
2019-07-01SenateReptd Fav
2019-06-27SenateRe-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
2019-06-27SenateReptd Fav
2019-06-19SenateRe-ref Com On Pensions and Retirement and Aging
2019-06-19SenateReptd Fav
2019-06-13SenateRe-ref to Judiciary. If fav, re-ref to Pensions and Retirement and Aging. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate
2019-06-13SenateWithdrawn From Com
2019-03-21SenateRef To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
2019-03-21SenatePassed 1st Reading
2019-03-21SenateRegular Message Received From House
2019-03-21HouseRegular Message Sent To Senate
2019-03-20HousePassed 3rd Reading
2019-03-20HousePassed 2nd Reading
2019-03-18HousePlaced On Cal For 03/20/2019
2019-03-18HouseWithdrawn From Com
2019-03-18HouseRe-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
2019-03-18HouseReptd Fav Com Sub 2
2019-03-13HouseRe-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
2019-03-13HouseReptd Fav Com Substitute
2019-03-07HouseRef to the Com on Judiciary, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
2019-03-07HousePassed 1st Reading
2019-03-06HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

S306 (Same As) 2019-03-20 - Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate

North Carolina State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.ncleg.gov/BillLookUp/2019/H283
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2019/Bills/House/PDF/H283v0.pdf
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2019/Bills/House/PDF/H283v1.pdf
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2019/Bills/House/PDF/H283v2.pdf
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2019/Bills/House/PDF/H283v3.pdf
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2019/Bills/House/PDF/H283v4.pdf
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2019/Bills/House/PDF/H283v5.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.ncleg.gov/Legislation/Votes/RollCallVoteTranscript/2019/H/81
Roll Callhttps://www.ncleg.gov/Legislation/Votes/RollCallVoteTranscript/2019/S/577
Roll Callhttps://www.ncleg.gov/Legislation/Votes/RollCallVoteTranscript/2019/S/578
Roll Callhttps://www.ncleg.gov/Legislation/Votes/RollCallVoteTranscript/2019/S/583
Roll Callhttps://www.ncleg.gov/Legislation/Votes/RollCallVoteTranscript/2019/H/828

Bill Comments

feedback