NC H285 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 10 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-10 - Ch. SL 2019-105
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

City of Sanford/Town of Beaufort/Vol Annex

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

City of Sanford/Town of Beaufort/Vol Annex

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-07-09 - House - M11 Concur R3 Ruled Mat'l (Y: 111 N: 3 NV: 3 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-07-08 - House - M11 Concur R2 Ruled Mat'l (Y: 112 N: 3 NV: 3 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-07-01 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-06-26 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-04-04 - House - Third Reading (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 23) [PASS]
2019-04-03 - House - Second Reading (Y: 109 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 7) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-07-10 Ch. SL 2019-105
2019-07-10 Ratified
2019-07-09HouseOrdered Enrolled
2019-07-09HouseConcurred On 3rd Reading
2019-07-08HouseConcurred On 2nd Reading
2019-07-04HousePlaced On Cal For 07/08/2019
2019-07-04HouseRuled Material
2019-07-04HouseCal Pursuant 36(b)
2019-07-02HouseRegular Message Received For Concurrence in S Com Sub
2019-07-02SenateRegular Message Sent To House
2019-07-01SenatePassed 3rd Reading
2019-06-27SenatePlaced On Cal For 07/01/2019
2019-06-27SenateWithdrawn From Cal
2019-06-26SenatePassed 2nd Reading
2019-06-25SenateReptd Fav
2019-06-18SenateRe-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
2019-06-18SenateReptd Fav
2019-06-04SenateRe-ref Com On Finance
2019-06-04SenateCom Substitute Adopted
2019-06-04SenateReptd Fav Com Substitute
2019-05-24SenateRe-ref to State and Local Government. If fav, re-ref to Finance. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate
2019-05-24SenateWithdrawn From Com
2019-04-08SenateRef To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
2019-04-08SenatePassed 1st Reading
2019-04-08SenateRegular Message Received From House
2019-04-05HouseRegular Message Sent To Senate
2019-04-04HousePassed 3rd Reading
2019-04-03HousePassed 2nd Reading
2019-04-01HousePlaced On Cal For 04/03/2019
2019-04-01HouseCal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
2019-04-01HouseReptd Fav
2019-03-27HouseRe-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
2019-03-27HouseReptd Fav
2019-03-13HouseRe-ref Com On Finance
2019-03-13HouseReptd Fav
2019-03-07HouseRef to the Com on State and Local Government, if favorable, Finance, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
2019-03-07HousePassed 1st Reading
2019-03-06HouseFiled

North Carolina State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.ncleg.gov/BillLookUp/2019/H285
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2019/Bills/House/PDF/H285v0.pdf
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2019/Bills/House/PDF/H285v1.pdf
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2019/Bills/House/PDF/H285v2.pdf
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2019/Bills/House/PDF/H285v3.pdf
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2019/Bills/House/PDF/H285v4.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.ncleg.gov/Legislation/Votes/RollCallVoteTranscript/2019/H/135
Roll Callhttps://www.ncleg.gov/Legislation/Votes/RollCallVoteTranscript/2019/H/106
Roll Callhttps://www.ncleg.gov/Legislation/Votes/RollCallVoteTranscript/2019/S/357
Roll Callhttps://www.ncleg.gov/Legislation/Votes/RollCallVoteTranscript/2019/S/397
Roll Callhttps://www.ncleg.gov/Legislation/Votes/RollCallVoteTranscript/2019/H/569
Roll Callhttps://www.ncleg.gov/Legislation/Votes/RollCallVoteTranscript/2019/H/594

Bill Comments

feedback