NC H289 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 11-3)
Status: Passed on June 19 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-19 - Ch. SL 2013-128
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 11-3)
Status: Passed on June 19 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-19 - Ch. SL 2013-128
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
State Computer Equipment/Buy Refurbished
Title
State Computer Equipment/Buy Refurbished
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-06-12 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2013-04-15 - House - Second Reading (Y: 112 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2013-04-15 - House - Second Reading (Y: 112 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-06-19 | Ch. SL 2013-128 | |
2013-06-19 | Signed by Gov. 6/19/2013 | |
2013-06-13 | Pres. To Gov. 6/14/2013 | |
2013-06-13 | Ratified | |
2013-06-12 | Senate | Ordered Enrolled |
2013-06-12 | Senate | Passed 3rd Reading |
2013-06-12 | Senate | Passed 2nd Reading |
2013-06-11 | Senate | Reptd Fav |
2013-04-16 | Senate | Ref To Com On State and Local Government |
2013-04-16 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2013-04-16 | Senate | Rec From House |
2013-04-15 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2013-04-15 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2013-04-11 | House | Placed On Cal For 04/15/2013 |
2013-04-11 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2013-04-11 | House | Reptd Fav |
2013-03-13 | House | Ref To Com On Government |
2013-03-13 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2013-03-12 | House | Filed |