NC H29 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 46-13)
Status: Passed on September 18 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-09-18 - Ch. SL 2019-221
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Standing Up for Rape Victims Act of 2019

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Standing Up for Rape Victims Act of 2019

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-09-16 - House - M11 Concur (Y: 110 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-09-11 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-05-02 - House - Second Reading (Y: 116 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-09-18 Ch. SL 2019-221
2019-09-18 Signed by Gov. 9/18/2019
2019-09-18 Pres. To Gov. 9/18/2019
2019-09-17 Ratified
2019-09-16HouseOrdered Enrolled
2019-09-16HouseConcurred In S Com Sub
2019-09-13HousePlaced On Cal For 09/16/2019
2019-09-12HouseCal Pursuant 36(b)
2019-09-11HouseSpecial Message Received For Concurrence in S Com Sub
2019-09-11SenateSpecial Message Sent To House
2019-09-11SenatePassed 3rd Reading
2019-09-11SenatePassed 2nd Reading
2019-09-10SenateCom Substitute Adopted
2019-09-10SenateReptd Fav Com Substitute
2019-09-10SenateSequential Referral To Rules and Operations of the Senate Stricken
2019-09-06SenateRe-ref to Appropriations/Base Budget. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate
2019-09-06SenateWithdrawn From Com
2019-05-06SenateRef To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
2019-05-06SenatePassed 1st Reading
2019-05-06SenateRegular Message Received From House
2019-05-03HouseRegular Message Sent To Senate
2019-05-02HousePassed 3rd Reading
2019-05-02HousePassed 2nd Reading
2019-05-01HousePlaced On Cal For 05/02/2019
2019-05-01HouseCal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
2019-05-01HouseReptd Fav
2019-04-29HouseRe-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
2019-04-29HouseWithdrawn From Com
2019-04-29HouseSerial Referral To Appropriations Stricken
2019-04-29HouseRe-ref Com On Appropriations, Justice and Public Safety
2019-04-29HouseReptd Fav Com Substitute
2019-02-07HouseRef to the Com on Judiciary, if favorable, Appropriations, Justice and Public Safety, if favorable, Appropriations, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
2019-02-07HousePassed 1st Reading
2019-02-05HouseFiled

North Carolina State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback