NC H3 | 2018 | 1st Special Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on August 4 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-04 - Ch. SL 2018-131
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Ballot Designations/Referenda

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Ballot Designations/Referenda

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-08-04 - Senate - Motion 11 Veto Override (Y: 28 N: 12 NV: 1 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2018-08-04 - House - Veto Override (Y: 70 N: 39 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2018-07-24 - House - Second Reading (Y: 66 N: 36 NV: 5 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2018-07-24 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 26 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-08-04 Ch. SL 2018-131
2018-08-04SenateVeto Overridden
2018-08-04SenatePlaced on Today's Calendar
2018-08-04SenateVeto Received from the House
2018-08-04HouseVeto Overridden
2018-07-30HousePlaced On Cal For 08/04/2018
2018-07-27HouseReceived from the Governor
2018-07-27 Vetoed 07/27/2018
2018-07-24 Pres. To Gov. 7/24/2018
2018-07-24 Ratified
2018-07-24SenateOrdered Enrolled
2018-07-24SenatePassed 3rd Reading
2018-07-24SenatePassed 2nd Reading
2018-07-24SenatePlaced on Today's Calendar
2018-07-24SenateReptd Fav
2018-07-24SenateRe-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
2018-07-24SenateReptd Fav
2018-07-24SenateRef to Select Committee on Elections. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate
2018-07-24SenatePassed 1st Reading
2018-07-24SenateSpecial Message Received From House
2018-07-24HouseSpecial Message Sent To Senate
2018-07-24HousePassed 3rd Reading
2018-07-24HousePassed 2nd Reading
2018-07-24HouseAdded to Calendar
2018-07-24HouseCal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
2018-07-24HouseReptd Fav
2018-07-24HouseRef To Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
2018-07-24HousePassed 1st Reading
2018-07-24HouseFiled

North Carolina State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.ncga.state.nc.us/gascripts/BillLookUp/BillLookUp.pl?Session=2017E1&BillID=H3&votesToView=all
Texthttp://www.ncga.state.nc.us/Sessions/2017E1/Bills/House/HTML/H3v0.html
Texthttp://www.ncga.state.nc.us/Sessions/2017E1/Bills/House/HTML/H3v1.html
Texthttp://www.ncga.state.nc.us/Sessions/2017E1/Bills/House/HTML/H3v2.html
Texthttp://www.ncga.state.nc.us/Sessions/2017E1/Bills/House/HTML/H3v3.html
Roll Callhttp://www.ncga.state.nc.us/gascripts/voteHistory/RollCallVoteTranscript.pl?sSession=2017E1&sChamber=S&RCS=2
Roll Callhttp://www.ncga.state.nc.us/gascripts/voteHistory/RollCallVoteTranscript.pl?sSession=2017E1&sChamber=H&RCS=3
Roll Callhttp://www.ncga.state.nc.us/gascripts/voteHistory/RollCallVoteTranscript.pl?sSession=2017E1&sChamber=H&RCS=5
Roll Callhttp://www.ncga.state.nc.us/gascripts/voteHistory/RollCallVoteTranscript.pl?sSession=2017E1&sChamber=S&RCS=6

Bill Comments

feedback